Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 813 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2494 Week
» 22787 Month
» 200691 Year
» 1866067 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7334 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77334 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90244 m/e 07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25202
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal Thu 09/08/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/12/1948
NWE   New England w/e 26/11/1949
NWE   New England m/e 30/11/1949
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
35A   New England 5w/e 24/03/1956
33B   Tilbury 4w/e 10/05/1958
31B   March w/e 04/07/1959
33A   Plaistow w/e 10/10/1959
33B   Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
     Withdrawn on 09/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN WFD Woodford Halse on 29/04/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 29/06/1947
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse on 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/12/1948
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 09/08/1962
WDN   w/e 04/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7334
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25202
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77334    
04/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
26/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
07/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90244    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
09/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90244    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford    

prev prev