Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 763 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2444 Week
» 22737 Month
» 200641 Year
» 1866017 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7335 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77335 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90245 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25203
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
26A   Newton Heath w/e 26/05/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 16/06/1951
27B   Aintree w/e 12/12/1959
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 02/01/1960
WDN   w/e 02/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. SLS/194805
30/04/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1422/53, 2053, 2230/33, 2414, 2805/10/25, 2915/30/34/35, 3421, 3610, 3709, 3824/48/58, 4017/19/50/89/92/99, 4248/57, 4500/24/50/74/75, 4706, 4906/09/37/63/64, 5037,91/95, 5314, 5900/06124/30/41/60/64/81, 6009/21/26, 6119/24/34/51/62/68, 6313/56/72/98, 6806/63, 6918, 7003, 7321, W.D. 77000, 78607, 79283/288. W.D. No. 77060/145/280/335, 78624 an 79244 have had their tenders removed and were taken to the stock shed on 25/3, where they are now stored. Works' pilots have been: Nos. 198, 1713/53, 2781 an 15102 PDN. New Work 30/4: 15102 PDN (being run in as Works' pilot); 6990; 9662 NPT, 9663 TN, 9664 NPT, 9665, 9666 NEA; 7008 being nearly complete. Engines condemned during April included: Nos. 302 an 3408 SLS/194806
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7335
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25203
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77335    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90245    
26/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90245    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev