Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 833 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4346 Week
» 24639 Month
» 202543 Year
» 1867919 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7336 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77336 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3009 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63009 w/e 20/03/1948
British Railways 90009 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25204
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal Fri 01/09/1967
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
HLS   Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
52G   Sunderland 4w/e 15/07/1967
     Withdrawn on 01/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK WFD Woodford Halse on 13/03/1946
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 06/04/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 15/07/1967
WDN   on 01/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7336
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25204
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77336    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3009    
20/03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63009    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90009    
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90009    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev