Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 830 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4343 Week
» 24636 Month
» 202540 Year
» 1867916 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7338 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77338 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90246 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25206
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal During 04/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
MEX   Mexborough w/e 24/12/1949
35A   New England w/e 03/11/1951
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 09/11/1963
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN YK York (North) on 14/03/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead on 20/04/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 35A New England w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 25/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7338
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25206
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77338    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90246    
03/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90246    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev