Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 751 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2432 Week
» 22725 Month
» 200629 Year
» 1866005 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7339 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77339 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3010 m/e 04/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63010 w/e 15/05/1948
British Railways 90010 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25207
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/02/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
HLS   Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 11/02/1950
53C   Hull Springhead on 21/05/1950
53C   Hull Springhead 4w/e 30/06/1950
91W   To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 31/08/1951
40B   Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953
84D   Leamington 4w/e 27/03/1954
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 14/07/1956
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 25/01/1958
18B   Westhouses w/e 18/07/1959
9G   Gorton w/e 30/06/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 06/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK WFD Woodford Halse on 18/03/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 29/06/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead on 21/05/1950
LOAN 40B Immingham on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 22/09/1951
LOAN 84B Oxley m/e 31/10/1951
LOAN 84D Leamington 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 18B Westhouses on 12/07/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1959
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 06/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7339
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25207
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77339    
04/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3010    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63010    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90010    
11/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
06/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90010    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev