Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 765 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4278 Week
» 24571 Month
» 202475 Year
» 1867851 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7340 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77340 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90247 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25210
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal Mon 12/11/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1963 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 05/02/1951
27B   Aintree w/e 23/06/1951
27B   Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 17/07/1951
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 11/08/1951
55E   Normanton 4w/e 19/10/1957
     Withdrawn on 12/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN BTN Brighton P 01/12/1947
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 23/06/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   on 12/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/11/1949 Brighton Works On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . SLS/194912
22/11/1949 Brighton Works On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . SLS/194912
30/09/1950 General Now that the new 2-6-4 tanks are arriving at Tunbridge Wells West, the Maunsell 0-6-0s of class, 'Q' which had been on the Oxted line passenger jobs have been transferred to other sheds for freight duties. Nos. 42096-42101 had arrived to the beginning of September, and a few more are expected. Others under construction in Brighton Works are 42103-42106, 42066-42069. This method of 'numbering backward' savours of L.M.S. methods, though it is understood that after reaching 42095 the next will be 82010 (but not this year!)
It is not unusual to see class '5MT' from the L.M.R. at Brighton, chiefly on Sundays or in mid-week: the shedplates are usually 2A or 1A, e.g., 45020 an 45353, but 45233 with a 26A plate was something rather out of the ordinary on 27th August.
Little progress has been made recently with the last of the 4-6-2 to be built at Brighton (No. 34110): precedence is doubtless being given to the class '4' tanks. Only a few 2-8-0 seem to be in traffic round Brighton nowadays, though several are in Brighton shops for heavy repair; 90247, however, is much in evidence with its 4B shedplate, a legacy from its' Shrewsbury days.
Several Central Section engines have now had their 75A plates affixed, the earliest noted being 31556, 32505, 32509, 32339, 32424, but the number grows daily. Eastern section engines working in have not had shedplates up to the end of August.
Early in September the last active 0-4-2T No. 2252 was regularly on the Horsham auto, leaving Brighton about 4 p.m.; it is feared that this veteran may soon wear out its boiler, and then-goodbye?
SLS/195010
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7340
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25210
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77340    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90247    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
12/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90247    
03/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    

prev prev