Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 854 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2535 Week
» 22828 Month
» 200732 Year
» 1866108 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7342 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77342 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90248 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25212
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/11/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966 at W George, Station Steel (Wath)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
STM   St Margarets w/e 04/12/1948
26A   Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1951
26F   Patricroft w/e 15/09/1962
26A   Newton Heath w/e 05/01/1963
9K   Bolton w/e 14/03/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 03/10/1964
36C   Frodingham w/e 17/04/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 07/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK NPT Newport (Teeside) on 25/03/1947
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 04/12/1948
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 05/01/1963
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 04/04/1964
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 01/05/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 08/05/1965
WDN   w/e 07/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. SLS/195001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7342
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25212
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77342    
04/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90248    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
05/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
14/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
07/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90248    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath    

prev prev