Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 821 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4334 Week
» 24627 Month
» 202531 Year
» 1867907 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7343 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77343 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3011 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63011 w/e 26/06/1948
British Railways 90011 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25213
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal Sun 05/06/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
HLS   Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
53C   Hull Springhead on 21/05/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 06/12/1958
51A   Darlington w/e 20/06/1959
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 26/03/1966
     Withdrawn on 05/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK WFD Woodford Halse on 21/03/1946
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 06/04/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead on 21/05/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 01/12/1958
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 26/03/1966
WDN   on 05/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/07/1962 Darlington MPD (Ex Works) Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). SLS/196209
18/01/1964 Darlington MPD (Repair Shops Under Light Repairs) Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. SLS/196402
04/07/1964 Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. SLS/196408
19/09/1964 Darlington MPD (Shed) On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7343
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25213
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77343    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3011    
26/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63011    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90011    
06/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
26/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
05/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90011    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev