Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 852 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2533 Week
» 22826 Month
» 200730 Year
» 1866106 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7348 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77348 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90249 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25218
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal w/e Mon 23/12/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse m/e 16/06/1956
55E   Normanton w/e 07/11/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 23/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 04/06/1949
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 16/06/1956
EXLOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   w/e 23/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710
18/01/1964 Darlington MPD (Stored) Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7348
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25218
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77348    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90249    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
23/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90249    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev