Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 810 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4323 Week
» 24616 Month
» 202520 Year
» 1867896 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7350 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77350 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90250 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25220
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 24/03/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
MEX   Mexborough (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 04/11/1947
     Withdrawn w/e 24/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 04/11/1947
WDN   on 24/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1963 Doncaster Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. SLS/196304
11/05/1963 Worcester Works (Works Yard) 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. SLS/196304
10/03/1963 Goole MPD (Stored in Works Yards) Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. SLS/196304
23/04/1963 Doncaster Works (Stored in Works Yards) New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7350
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25220
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77350    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90250    
24/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90250    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev