Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 848 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2529 Week
» 22822 Month
» 200726 Year
» 1866102 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7351 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77351 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90251 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25221
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/05/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
NWE   New England w/e 18/09/1948
GRA   Grantham w/e 29/01/1949
38A   Colwick 3w/e 31/05/1950
38A   Colwick on 04/06/1950
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 19/04/1952
82B   St Philips Marsh 3w/e 17/05/1952
81F   Oxford m/e 16/06/1956
18B   Westhouses w/e 18/07/1959
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 19/09/1959
18B   Westhouses w/e 05/12/1959
9G   Gorton w/e 30/06/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 11/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 31/05/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick on 04/06/1950
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 06/10/1951
LOAN 84B Oxley 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 18B Westhouses on 12/07/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1959
LOAN 2F Woodford Halse 3w/e 26/09/1959
EXLOAN 18B Westhouses 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 11/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102
04/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7351
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25221
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77351    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
29/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90251    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
11/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90251    
10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev