Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 853 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4366 Week
» 24659 Month
» 202563 Year
» 1867939 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7353 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77353 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90253 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25223
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
MEX   Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
31B   March on 18/06/1950
35A   New England w/e 20/08/1950
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HLS Hull Springhead on 07/03/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 31B March on 18/06/1950
ALLOC 35A New England w/e 20/08/1950
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1963 Doncaster Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. SLS/196304
11/05/1963 Worcester Works (Scrap Yard) 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. SLS/196304
10/03/1963 Goole MPD (Stored in Works Yards) Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. SLS/196304
23/04/1963 Doncaster Works (Stored in Works Yards) New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7353
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25223
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77353    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90253    
18/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90253    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev