Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 804 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4317 Week
» 24610 Month
» 202514 Year
» 1867890 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7354 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77354 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3015 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63015 w/e 24/07/1948
British Railways 90015 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25224
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Sat 18/05/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 14/02/1953
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
34E   New England w/e 21/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 18/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   on 18/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/08/1963 Doncaster Works (Crimpsall Steam Bay) New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7354
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25224
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77354    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3015    
24/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63015    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90015    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
18/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90015    
07/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev