Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 840 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2521 Week
» 22814 Month
» 200718 Year
» 1866094 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7355 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77355 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90254 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25230
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Tue 31/01/1967
Service Life 23 yrs , 5 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
26B   Agecroft w/e 09/06/1951
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 16/06/1951
26B   Agecroft 8w/e 27/06/1951
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 21/04/1956
55E   Normanton w/e 07/11/1959
55D   Royston w/e 01/09/1962
55C   Farnley Junction w/e 13/07/1963
55D   Royston w/e 14/12/1963
55E   Normanton w/e 13/06/1964
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 09/10/1965
50A   York (North) 4w/e 04/12/1965
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 08/10/1966
     Withdrawn on 31/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 09/06/1951
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 55C Farnley Junction 5w/e 10/08/1963
ALLOC 55D Royston 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 55E Normanton 5w/e 13/06/1964
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 04/12/1965
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   on 31/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
21/09/1950 Brighton Works The Works were open to the public on Wednesday afternoon, 21st September, the special feature being the construction of the new 2-6-4T from the initial stages right up to the completed machine; No. 42103 was the exhibited finished product, in steam-to the delight of many boys who had to operate the hooter-while next to it was the Works Terrier, also in steam-so that many whistling competitions were in progress by the youthful fraternity. No. 42104 was outside, and ran trial trip during the afternoon. No. 42105 was being painted, 42106 well adanced, while 42066-42072 were in progress, the latter being a pair of frames not yet set up. 'B.o.B.' No. 34082 615 Squadron was also on view with facilities for footplate inspection as in the case of Nos. 42103 and 377S. Very few engines were under repair: 90360, 90254 and a Brighton C2x with 2-dome boiler and an I.3 tank. The partly erected 'Pacific' No. 34110 was also available, the boiler being mounted (temporarily at any rate) on the frames. SLS/195101
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104
13/08/1967 West Hartlepool MPD The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7355
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25230
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77355    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90254    
09/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
01/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
13/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
13/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
31/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90254    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev