Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 801 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4314 Week
» 24607 Month
» 202511 Year
» 1867887 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7356 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77356 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90255 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25232
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/12/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966 at W George, Station Steel (Wath)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
31B   March 4w/e 22/09/1956
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 16/03/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 26/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK MEX Mexborough on 17/04/1947
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   w/e 26/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7356
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25232
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77356    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90255    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
26/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90255    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath    

prev prev