Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 850 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4363 Week
» 24656 Month
» 202560 Year
» 1867936 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7357 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77357 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3016 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63016 w/e 17/04/1948
British Railways 90016 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25222
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
56A   Wakefield w/e 28/03/1959
51A   Darlington w/e 18/06/1960
52H   Tyne Dock w/e 08/12/1962
56A   Wakefield w/e 21/12/1963
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 27/02/1965
50B   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 26/03/1966
50D   Goole 4w/e 31/12/1966
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 11/12/1945
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 51A Darlington 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock w/e 08/12/1962
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 27/02/1965
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 26/03/1966
ALLOC 50D Goole 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
28/11/1953 Darlington Works North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. SLS/195402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7357
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25222
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77357    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3016    
17/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63016    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90016    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
28/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
27/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
26/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90016    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev