Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 797 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2478 Week
» 22771 Month
» 200675 Year
» 1866051 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7358 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77358 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90256 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25225
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Mon 27/08/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
GRA   Grantham w/e 29/01/1949
NWE   New England w/e 11/06/1949
25A   Wakefield w/e 15/09/1951
33A   Plaistow 5w/e 23/07/1955
33B   Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
     Withdrawn on 27/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 11/06/1949
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 27/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 Crewe - Smoke deflectors Smoke deflectors are being fitted to all the non-streamlined Princess Coronation locos in the same way as with 6232/52. 6234/3/50 have so far been so treated. SLS/194605
30/03/1946 W.D. ENGINES IN HOLLAND The initials N.S. indicates Nederlandsche Spoorwegen, i.e. Netherlands Railways: this being not a State to concern but a limited liability company. Reference to the Netherlands State Railways is thus incorrect.
Another point is that all W.D. locos in Holland are on to loan and have not been purchased. They still have their W.D. numbers in addition to their N.S numbers.
Six more 0-6-0 saddle tanks are on loan:-N.S. 8822 to 8827, W.D. 75026/53/86, 75104/15/99.
The 2-8-0's (W.D. 77125, 77238) which were allotted N.S. 4528/9 were in an accident last August, and were sent to Malines Works in Belgium. After overhaul, they went to to Western Germany, and so never bore their N.S. numbers. Ten more W.D. 2 8 0's went to the N.S. on loan in January, 1946:-N.S. 4528 to 4537, W.D. 77009/10, 77193/4/7, 77011/38, 77188/90, 77358. Of these, 77193/4/7 came from the Dutch State Mines in Limburg. At the same time N.S. 4511 (W.D. 79196) went to the State Mines (S.M.), while N.S. 4504/9 (W.D. 78677 and 79189) left for Belgium. These three locos. are no longer on the N.S. list. W.D. 77193 was S.M. 62.
Also noted S.M. 74 (W.D. 75002).
Sixty 2-10-0's are on loan to the N.S. from January, 1946:-N.S. 5001 to 5060: W.D. 73650/61/2/4-71/3/5/6/9-81/9-93/5-9, 73700/1/4-7/9/11-3/5/7-22/7/9/32-4/6-41/4/5/7-9.
SLS/194605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7358
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25225
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77358    
29/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90256    
11/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
27/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90256    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford    

prev prev