Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 153 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3666 Week
» 23959 Month
» 201863 Year
» 1867239 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7359 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77359 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90257 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25226
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 24/02/1951
91M   To London Midland Region 6w/e 14/03/1951
25D   Mirfield m/e 31/03/1951
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 31/10/1953
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 27/02/1954
8D   Widnes w/e 25/07/1959
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 07/11/1959
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 25D Mirfield m/e 31/03/1951
LOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 31/10/1953
LOAN 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 8D Widnes 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 01/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/11/1948 Brighton Works In shops for repair: Nos, 32501 an 77359 (ready); 31919 an 32501 (nearly ready); 680S; CC1 (to be 20001); 1899, 2339, 2512, 2563, 32523, 77256; 34064 (lighter green livery). New construction Nos. 34085-90; 36001; boilers and tenders for 'Merchant Navy' Class. SLS/194812
06/05/1950 Brighton Works Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. SLS/195006
06/05/1950 Brighton Works Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. SLS/195006
10/06/1950 Brighton Works On the occasion of the Works visit on Saturday, 10th June, the following were noted: e20001 (new livery), 31295 (lined), 31706, 32460, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34074, 34082 615 Squadron (30)272, 32636 (lined, waiting boiler), 42096 (tanks being fitted), 42097 (boiler in), frames up to 42102, frames of 34110, 77108/90570 (V.F.4924/43), 77359/90207, 90702, 77030/90127, and the works shunters 377S an 2235. Diesel 15203 was still outside after repair and repaint. The transfer of the 'W.D. 8F' proceeds apace; they were most useful on the Southern Region for maintaining quick goods working between the frequent passenger services (mostly electric), as they had a good turn of speed;, and they were used on empty stock and mixed trains. SLS/195007
30/06/1950 Brighton Works New construction: 4-6-2 34110; 2-6-4T 42097-42166, the first three being in a forward stage. 42096 came out early in July and bears a Brighton date plate, 1950. In for repair: 0-6-OT 515S; 0-6-2T 32460, 32594; 4-4-2T 32083; 2-6-0 32347; 2-8-0 77030, 77108, 77359; 4-6-2 34036, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34038 Lynton, 34082 615 Squadron. 34036 will probably now receive its name-plates Westward Ho!: this was the engine which was fitted to burn oil on the Laidlaw-Drew method till September 1948, when it was re-converted at Eastleigh to burn coal: for some reason the plates were not then affixed. The 'D.3' 32378 compares unfavourably in appearance with others of the class, as it is painted unlined black without even the usual emblem: on the other hand 32386 is kept in good condition, and the lining and emblem make it look attractive. The class 'G.6' tank recently repaired at Brighton has not been renumbered 30272 as anticipated, but is now DS3152 with tanks lettered -Engineer's Dept.' Meldon Quarry.' There is no mention of British Railways on the tanks.
B.O.B. 34074 is now named 46 Squadron. Engines going through Brighton shops hitherto have been very thoroughly brought into line with latest ideas as to lettering, etc., but 'R.1' bogie tank 31706 has had SOUTHERN replaced by the B.R. totem, yet still retaining the green shaded numerals on the bunker. The side tanks only have been repainted.
SLS/195008
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7359
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25226
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77359    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90257    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
14/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
25/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90257    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev