Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 845 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4358 Week
» 24651 Month
» 202555 Year
» 1867931 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7360 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77360 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3017 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63017 w/e 04/09/1948
British Railways 90017 m/e 06/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25227
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Mon 16/09/1963
Service Life 20 yrs , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Campbells (Airdrie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
DEE   Dundee Tay Bridge w/e 01/10/1949
62C   Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 06/10/1951
     Withdrawn on 16/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK DFU Dunfermline Upper w/e 16/03/1946
ALLOC DEE Dundee Tay Bridge w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 06/10/1951
WDN   on 16/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
30/08/1961 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7360
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25227
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77360    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3017    
04/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63017    
01/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
06/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90017    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
16/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90017    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev