Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 832 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2513 Week
» 22806 Month
» 200710 Year
» 1866086 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7362 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77362 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90258 w/e 09/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25229
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 23/01/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
24C   Lostock Hall 4w/e 23/02/1952
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 12/09/1964
41H   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 16/01/1965
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 19/06/1965
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 09/10/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 23/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN STM St Margarets on 15/03/1947
LOAN 24B Rose Grove on 20/01/1949
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 23/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7362
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25229
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77362    
09/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90258    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
23/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90258    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev