Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 827 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2508 Week
» 22801 Month
» 200705 Year
» 1866081 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7364 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77364 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90259 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25235
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/10/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
NWE   New England w/e 13/11/1948
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 22/01/1955
40E   Colwick w/e 07/05/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 11/05/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 14/05/1960
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1947 Shakespeare Cliff There were 22 'Austerity' 2-8-0's on the sidings west of Shakespeare Cliff Tunnel on 3/1/47. and these included 77078, 77085, 77095, 77162, 77222, 77292, 77300, 77364, 77371, 77390, 77395, 78588, NS4320, NS4342, NS4364, NS4400, and six more, whose numbers could not be read. SLS/194702
10/12/1965 Doncaster MPD Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. SLS/196601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7364
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25235
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77364    
13/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90259    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
03/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90259    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev