Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 788 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2469 Week
» 22762 Month
» 200666 Year
» 1866042 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7365 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77365 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90260 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25236
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Mon 02/09/1963
Service Life 20 yrs , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
25A   Wakefield w/e 01/09/1951
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 08/09/1951
25C   Goole 4w/e 10/09/1955
     Withdrawn on 02/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 12/05/1948
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 01/09/1951
LOAN 25C Goole 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 25C Goole 4w/e 08/10/1955
WDN   on 02/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   In L.N.E.R. Shops   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1947 Darlington Works The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7365
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25236
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77365    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90260    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
02/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90260    

prev prev