Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 780 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2461 Week
» 22754 Month
» 200658 Year
» 1866034 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7367 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77367 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3019 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63019 w/e 01/05/1948
British Railways 90019 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25238
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Tue 17/12/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
     Withdrawn on 17/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC THJ Thornton Junction on 29/11/1946
WDN   on 17/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
17/05/1947 Eastfield MPD New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). SLS/194708
31/12/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. SLS/195002
02/11/1963 Inverurie Works (Cut Up) Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7367
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25238
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77367    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3019    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63019    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90019    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    
17/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90019    

prev prev