Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 780 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4293 Week
» 24586 Month
» 202490 Year
» 1867866 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7369 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77369 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3023 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63023 w/e 28/08/1948
British Railways 90023 w/e 25/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25240
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Wed 05/09/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
31F   Spital Bridge w/e 26/12/1959
33B   Tilbury w/e 06/02/1960
     Withdrawn on 05/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March on 29/11/1946
ALLOC 31F Spital Bridge 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 05/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7369
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25240
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77369    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3023    
28/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63023    
25/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90023    
26/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (31F)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
05/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90023    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford    

prev prev