Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 770 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2451 Week
» 22744 Month
» 200648 Year
» 1866024 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7370 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77370 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3024 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63024 4w/e 25/12/1948
British Railways 90024 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25241
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 24/10/1953
36B   Mexborough 5w/e 18/06/1955
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
34E   New England w/e 20/02/1960
36C   Frodingham w/e 29/09/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1963 Goole MPD (Weigh House) Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. SLS/196304
23/04/1963 Doncaster Works (Weigh House) New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7370
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25241
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77370    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3024    
25/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63024    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90024    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90024    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev