Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 837 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4350 Week
» 24643 Month
» 202547 Year
» 1867923 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7371 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77371 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90262 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25242
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1968 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
25C   Goole on 01/07/1950
50B   Hull Dairycoates w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK THJ Thornton Junction on 24/04/1947
ALLOC 25C Goole on 01/07/1950
ALLOC 25C Goole w/e 01/07/1950
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1947 Shakespeare Cliff There were 22 'Austerity' 2-8-0's on the sidings west of Shakespeare Cliff Tunnel on 3/1/47. and these included 77078, 77085, 77095, 77162, 77222, 77292, 77300, 77364, 77371, 77390, 77395, 78588, NS4320, NS4342, NS4364, NS4400, and six more, whose numbers could not be read. SLS/194702
31/01/1947 General Several 'Austerity' 2-8-0's are being repaired for service on the L.N.E.R. both at Eastleigh and Brighton, Nos. 77046/61, 77235, 77453/4, 77484 at the former and 77070, 77108, 77402/11/18, 79220, 78603, 77129, 77371/95, 77426 at the latter. 77411 has already left Brighton shops painted black, to he followed by 77070. Shed markings include La Delivrance, Le Mans, Desing Balls, Acheres, etc. Some of the tenders bear different numbers from the engines, but are renumbered to correspond with the engine number when painted. These engines are being classified '0.7' on the L.N.E.R. SLS/194702
30/11/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. SLS/195001
31/07/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. SLS/195010

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7371
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25242
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77371    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90262    
01/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90262    
01/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev