Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 767 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2448 Week
» 22741 Month
» 200645 Year
» 1866021 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7372 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77372 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90263 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25243
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
ANN   Annesley w/e 30/10/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 29/01/1949
WFD   Woodford Halse m/e 07/1949
WFD   Woodford Halse w/e 23/07/1949
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/11/1952
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 13/12/1952
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 27/12/1952
38A   Colwick 4w/e 16/05/1953
40B   Immingham w/e 13/12/1958
40E   Colwick w/e 15/08/1959
     Withdrawn on 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley on 22/02/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill on 05/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   on 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Works Sidings) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102
03/05/1964 Doncaster Works (Waiting Cutting Up) Near Erecting Shop: E3101-4 bodies. Works Yard: D1562 damaged, 68925, DEP100, D5513, D5593, D5815, D5816, D6734, D6737, D6757, D8234. Inside Erecting Shop: 12103, D1695, D2212, D2216, D2572, D3631, D4061, D5052, D5526, D5575, D5582, D5601, D5688, D5693, D5814, D5820, D5831, D5838, D6720, D6744, D8211, D8239, D8400, D9015. Side of Stripping Shop: D3446. Side of Erecting Shop: 63601. Waiting Cutting Up: 90263. Stripping Shop: D1508, D3484, D5564, D5603, D9008. Outside Weigh Shop: D380 ex works, D2013 ex works, D1509, D4031, D5573, D5631. Inside Paint Shop: LNER 4771, E1217, D2563, D6898. Waiting Works: 61104, 63594, 63645, 63836, 90717. Ex Works: D5528. Stored: 61080, 90111, 90165, 90583, 92169, 92170, 92175. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7372
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25243
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77372    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
29/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
23/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90263    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90263    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev