Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 834 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4347 Week
» 24640 Month
» 202544 Year
» 1867920 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7373 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77373 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3025 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63025 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90025 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25244
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 01/08/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
ANN   Annesley w/e 14/02/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 29/05/1948
38B   Annesley 4w/e 20/01/1951
38B   Annesley m/e 31/01/1951
40B   Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
40B   Immingham 5w/e 22/09/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/07/1953
36C   Frodingham w/e 22/10/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 01/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 11/12/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 30/03/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 01/08/1965
WDN   on 24/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/10/1958 Colwich MPD - stored locomotives 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7373
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25244
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77373    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3025    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63025 but not taken up    
14/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90025    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
01/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90025    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev