Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 811 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2492 Week
» 22785 Month
» 200689 Year
» 1866065 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7375 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77375 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90265 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25247
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
26A   Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1951
25A   Wakefield w/e 15/09/1951
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 06/10/1951
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse m/e 16/06/1956
53C   Hull Springhead 4w/e 12/04/1958
53E   Goole 5w/e 14/06/1958
50B   Hull Dairycoates w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN EFD Eastfield on 27/08/1947
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 53E Goole 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. SLS/195008
11/09/1966 Crewe Works (At side of Works) Erecting Shop: 44658, 44680, 44807, 44839/64, 45134/449, 60007, 70039, 73069, 90318/65, 92234, E3004/35/9/45, D216/8/46, D328, D368, D370/4, D391, D1104-11, D1583/8, D1600/8/10/3/86, D1762/76, D1865; Electric Shop: E3018/38/44/54, 26055; Adjacent to Electric Shop: D204/37, D311, D1515/20/46, D1663/80, D1761, D1858/9/81, D1915, D5105, D5107/11, D5711/4, 27005; Test Area: D222/3/74, D336/43, D1501, D1688, D1727/69/96, D5246, D5717, D8049; Traverser Area: D217, D322, D1503, D1627/53/67/72, D1764, D1876, D1904, D8000/7, 26017, 70052, 71000. At side of Works: 45131/8, 70006/17, 90265/396, D1604, D1782, D1812, D5710. Paint Shop: D367, D1103, D5709, E3008, 44776, 44800, 60010, 26037. SLS/196610

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7375
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25247
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77375    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90265    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (53E)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90265    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev