Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 750 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 22724 Month
» 200628 Year
» 1866004 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7378 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77378 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90266 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25250
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/07/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
LA   Laira 4w/e 30/10/1948
24A   Accrington 4w/e 03/12/1955
24C   Lostock Hall 4w/e 20/04/1957
24B   Rose Grove w/e 11/08/1962
9G   Gorton w/e 09/05/1964
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 12/09/1964
41H   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 16/01/1965
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 25/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN PDN Old Oak Common m/e 30/04/1947
LOAN RDG Reading (S.R.) m/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 30/10/1948
LOAN RDG Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 27/11/1948
LOAN 24D Lower Darwen on 11/05/1949
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 01/09/1962
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 25/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Vickers Armstrong Works Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). SLS/194904
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7378
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25250
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77378    
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90266    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
09/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
25/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90266    
09/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev