Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 824 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4337 Week
» 24630 Month
» 202534 Year
» 1867910 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7379 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77379 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90267 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25251
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/03/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
73C   Hither Green 3w/e 10/06/1950
73C   Hither Green 4w/e 17/06/1950
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 01/12/1951
24A   Accrington 4w/e 29/12/1951
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
27B   Aintree 4w/e 23/02/1952
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 04/10/1952
26C   Bolton 4w/e 18/04/1953
8L   Aintree w/e 03/10/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 13/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN FEL Feltham 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 3w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 01/12/1951
LOAN 24A Accrington 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 3w/e 03/10/1964
WDN   w/e 13/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/03/1950 Brighton Works Locomotives in shops for repair on 20/3 included: Nos. 15203, 31744, 32030/89, 32519/45, 32659, 34081, 36001, ex-W.D. 77098, 77321/79, 77460, 78531, 78666. Under construction Nos. 34106 Lydford (almost ready), 34107-09, and two 2-6-4 tanks. SLS/195004
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7379
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25251
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77379    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90267    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
13/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90267    
06/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev