Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 808 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2489 Week
» 22782 Month
» 200686 Year
» 1866062 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7380 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77380 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90268 m/e 12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25252
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/04/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Hayes (Bridgend)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
PPRD   Pontypool Road 4w/e 10/07/1948
86B   Newport Pill w/e 31/12/1950
86B   Newport Pill 4w/e 31/01/1951
81C   Southall 4w/e 30/04/1951
84C   Banbury 4w/e 11/07/1959
85C   Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 30/12/1961
84F   Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 24/02/1962
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) on 15/07/1962
26B   Agecroft w/e 01/06/1963
9G   Gorton w/e 10/10/1964
10H   Lower Darwen w/e 28/11/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 10/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CDF Cardiff Canton m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 86B Newport Pill w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 81C Southall m/e 30/04/1951
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 9G Gorton w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 10H Lower Darwen 4w/e 05/12/1964
WDN   w/e 10/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. SLS/194708
30/11/1948 Swindon Works New Work November: Nos. 6761 DYD (3/11), 6762 (4/11), 6763 (10/11), 6764 (12/11), 6765 (26/11); 4169 (15/11); 6991 Acton Burnell Hall WES (22/11), 6992 Arborfield Hall (26/11); Nos. 4168 an 6760 PILL were both completed on 29/10. Locomotives entering Works 28/10/48 to 26/11/48: These included Nos. 184 (condemned), 1013/27, 1331, 1435, 1538 (condemned - at present being used as Works pilot), 1749 (condemned), *1867 (condemned), *2010, *2121, *2187, 2249, *2706, *2717 (both condemned), 2819/71/74/88/96, 2906/32/40/43/53, 3169/86, 3624/77, 3733, 3806/41/64, 3951, 4015/18/25/60/81/83/92/93, 4123, 4287, 4508/53/84, 4665/91, 4900/60, 5031/32/49/67, 5121 (condemned), 5128/77, 5345, 5406/11, 5537/44/48, 5689, 5744/72/81/94, 5801, 5926/67/89, 6021, 6146, 6382/88, 6407, 6715, 6835/43/52, 6915/35/40/47/50/59/61, 7760, 7808, 8751, **9019 (condemned), 9310, 9754, 'Austerity' 77380. *Open cab. **Fitted small 2,000 gallon tender (No. 1128 of 4/96). Nos. 6991/92 came out painted black and fully lined, While Nos. 4168/69, 6760/65 are black and unlined. The following have been painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 4966/96, 5967/92, 6922/40/50 while Nos. 1362, 2194, 2252, 2840, 3685/96, 3811, 4290, 5214, 5384, 5563, 7234, 7716/64, 8768/77, 9310 an 9711 are painted black, but not lined. Nos. 3720 an 7702 have 'G.W.R.' on the tank sides and are fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 6009 has been fitted with a new standard cast iron smokebox num-berplate, in place of the former smaller brass one, all locomotives leaving Works are now fitted with smokebox numberplates. Locomotives noted with top feed boilers:-Nos. 3624/85/96, 5772/81, 5801, 7702/16/64, 8710/68/77, 9745. SLS/194901
31/12/1948 Swindon Works New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. SLS/194902
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7380
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25252
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77380    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B)    
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
12/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90268    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
15/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H)    
10/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90268    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend    

prev prev