Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 864 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4377 Week
» 24670 Month
» 202574 Year
» 1867950 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7381 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77381 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90269 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25254
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Sat 18/05/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
38A   Colwick 5w/e 24/07/1954
34E   New England w/e 21/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 18/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley on 21/08/1947
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) on 12/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   on 18/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
21/08/1963 Doncaster Works (Yard) New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7381
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25254
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77381    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90269    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
18/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90269    
07/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev