Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3638 Week
» 23931 Month
» 201835 Year
» 1867211 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7382 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77382 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3026 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63026 w/e 31/07/1948
British Railways 90026 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25255
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Mon 09/12/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 04/09/1948
HLS   Hull Springhead w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates m/e 12/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
54B   Tyne Dock w/e 25/02/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 04/02/1951
54B   Tyne Dock w/e 11/02/1951
54B   Tyne Dock 4w/e 17/02/1951
50B   Neville Hill 5w/e 20/07/1957
50A   York (North) w/e 12/12/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 09/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK WFD Woodford Halse on 06/03/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 29/06/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 04/02/1951
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock w/e 11/02/1951
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   w/e 09/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/01/1964 Darlington Works (Yard Sidings) Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7382
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25255
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77382    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3026    
31/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63026    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90026    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
25/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
04/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
11/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
09/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90026    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev