Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 242 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3274 Week
» 21326 Month
» 254246 Year
» 1919622 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7385 m/e 11/1943
War Dept. 77385 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3031 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63031 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90031 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25257
To Service During 11/1943
Withdrawal Sat 18/05/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1943
36C   Frodingham w/e 07/07/1951
36C   Frodingham 4w/e 21/07/1951
34E   New England w/e 11/11/1961
     Withdrawn on 18/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   on 18/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/05/1947 Doncaster Works Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7385
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25257
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77385    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3031    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63031 but not taken up    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90031    
07/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
11/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
18/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90031    
07/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev