Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 164 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3677 Week
» 23970 Month
» 201874 Year
» 1867250 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7390 m/e 11/1943
War Dept. 77390 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90272 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25260
To Service During 11/1943
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1943
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates m/e 12/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
54B   Tyne Dock w/e 25/02/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 11/02/1951
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 17/02/1951
50D   Goole 4w/e 20/05/1967
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK ANN Annesley on 04/02/1947
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock on 05/10/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 11/02/1951
ALLOC 50D Goole 4w/e 20/05/1967
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1947 Shakespeare Cliff There were 22 'Austerity' 2-8-0's on the sidings west of Shakespeare Cliff Tunnel on 3/1/47. and these included 77078, 77085, 77095, 77162, 77222, 77292, 77300, 77364, 77371, 77390, 77395, 78588, NS4320, NS4342, NS4364, NS4400, and six more, whose numbers could not be read. SLS/194702
01/02/1964 Branch line news (Erecting Shop) Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April.
The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964.
SLS/196403
07/03/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. SLS/196403

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7390
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25260
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77390    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90272    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
25/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
11/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90272    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev