Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 806 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2487 Week
» 22780 Month
» 200684 Year
» 1866060 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7391 m/e 11/1943
War Dept. 77391 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3032 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63032 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90032 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25261
To Service During 11/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1943
31B   March w/e 08/10/1950
31B   March 4w/e 21/10/1950
36C   Frodingham 5w/e 24/03/1951
36C   Frodingham m/e 31/03/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK IMM Immingham on 18/01/1947
ALLOC 31B March w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham m/e 31/03/1951
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/03/1949 Blaydon MPD On 19/3 the following Class '8' 2-8-0 W.D. locomotives were noted: No. 90032, fitted with Gresley type snifting valve, while Nos. 90363, 90652/82/94 were all fitted with G.W.R. type top feed. 'W.D. 2-8-0' was painted in white on the buffer beam. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7391
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25261
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77391    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3032    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63032 but not taken up    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90032    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90032    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev