Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 242 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1943 Week
» 10058 Month
» 137501 Year
» 1802877 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7393 m/e 11/1943
War Dept. 77393 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90274 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25263
To Service Sun 16/11/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/01/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys
Information Received at Swindo ex Marston sidings, 5/11/1947

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 16/11/1943
9G   Gorton w/e 09/05/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 26/12/1964
36C   Frodingham w/e 17/04/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 02/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN RDG Reading (S.R.) m/e 31/12/1947
LOAN 24B Rose Grove on 12/03/1949
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 01/05/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 08/05/1965
WDN   w/e 02/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport Swindon Works In G.W. Shops, Swindon   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1947 Brighton Works New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. SLS/194709
30/11/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. SLS/194801
21/02/1959 Gorton Works WD 2-8-0s from the Central Division (LMR) are now being shopped here-the first being 90274 (24B) and 90599 (27D). SLS/195904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1943 Renumbered Renumbered to 7393    
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77393    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90274    
09/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
26/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
02/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90274    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev