|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/08/1947 | Stratton Park | The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. | SLS/194709 |
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7394 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25264 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77394 | ||
10/11/1947 | Allocation | Loaned to Mexborough (MEX) (On loan from War Department) | ||
08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90275 | ||
30/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
20/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
04/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90275 | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |