Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 800 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4313 Week
» 24606 Month
» 202510 Year
» 1867886 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7395 m/e 11/1943
War Dept. 77395 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90276 w/e 30/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25265
To Service During 11/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 28/02/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1943
38A   Colwick 5w/e 24/07/1954
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 21/01/1956
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 27/02/1960
41H   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 26/03/1960
41D   Canklow w/e 02/04/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 28/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley on 14/08/1947
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) on 12/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/03/1960
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 16/04/1960
WDN   w/e 28/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1947 Shakespeare Cliff There were 22 'Austerity' 2-8-0's on the sidings west of Shakespeare Cliff Tunnel on 3/1/47. and these included 77078, 77085, 77095, 77162, 77222, 77292, 77300, 77364, 77371, 77390, 77395, 78588, NS4320, NS4342, NS4364, NS4400, and six more, whose numbers could not be read. SLS/194702
31/01/1947 General Several 'Austerity' 2-8-0's are being repaired for service on the L.N.E.R. both at Eastleigh and Brighton, Nos. 77046/61, 77235, 77453/4, 77484 at the former and 77070, 77108, 77402/11/18, 79220, 78603, 77129, 77371/95, 77426 at the latter. 77411 has already left Brighton shops painted black, to he followed by 77070. Shed markings include La Delivrance, Le Mans, Desing Balls, Acheres, etc. Some of the tenders bear different numbers from the engines, but are renumbered to correspond with the engine number when painted. These engines are being classified '0.7' on the L.N.E.R. SLS/194702
04/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7395
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25265
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77395    
30/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90276    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
28/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90276    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co.: Chesterfield    

prev prev