Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 797 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4310 Week
» 24603 Month
» 202507 Year
» 1867883 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7397 m/e 11/1943
War Dept. 77397 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3033 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63033 w/e 28/08/1948
British Railways 90033 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25267
To Service During 11/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/05/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1943
     Withdrawn w/e 25/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK WFD Woodford Halse on 18/03/1946
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 26/10/1946
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 25/05/1963
TOSTORE   w/e 14/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7397
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25267
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77397    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3033    
28/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63033    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90033    
25/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90033    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev