Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 836 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2517 Week
» 22810 Month
» 200714 Year
» 1866090 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7398 m/e 11/1943
War Dept. 77398 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90277 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25268
To Service During 11/1943
Withdrawal Sun 31/10/1965
Service Life 22 yrs

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1943
25E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 29/07/1950
25A   Wakefield m/e 30/11/1950
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 02/12/1950
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse m/e 16/06/1956
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 08/09/1956
24C   Lostock Hall 4w/e 06/10/1956
36A   Doncaster w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn on 31/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 29/07/1950
ALLOC 25A Wakefield m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   on 31/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/12/1965 Doncaster MPD Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. SLS/196601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7398
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25268
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77398    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90277    
29/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
31/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90277    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev