Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 793 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4306 Week
» 24599 Month
» 202503 Year
» 1867879 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7399 m/e 11/1943
War Dept. 77399 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90278 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25269
To Service During 11/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Horwich)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1943
DFU   Dunfermline Upper w/e 05/11/1949
24A   Accrington w/e 01/09/1951
24A   Accrington 4w/e 08/09/1951
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
27B   Aintree 4w/e 23/02/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 11/05/1948
ALLOC DFU Dunfermline Upper w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1947 Stratton Park The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. SLS/194709
30/04/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7399
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25269
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77399    
05/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90278    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90278    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Horwich    

prev prev