Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 159 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3672 Week
» 23965 Month
» 201869 Year
» 1867245 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7401 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77401 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90279 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25271
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/06/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
NWE   New England w/e 18/09/1948
31B   March 4w/e 14/12/1957
36A   Doncaster w/e 07/10/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 27/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 22/06/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   w/e 27/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Vickers Armstrong Works Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). SLS/194904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7401
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25271
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77401    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90279    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90279    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev