Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 804 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4317 Week
» 24610 Month
» 202514 Year
» 1867890 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7402 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77402 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90280 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25272
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/09/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
31B   March w/e 26/05/1951
31B   March 5w/e 23/06/1951
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 28/09/1963
36C   Frodingham w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 05/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN GOR Gorton on 04/03/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 23/03/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 12/10/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 31B March w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 05/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 W.D. Locomotives The following have been noted at Folkestone recently: 77070/81, 77122/9, 77222, 77402/11/26/84, 77508, 78588. As they carried allocations painted on the cab sides, they have presumably been in traffic on the continent. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 Locomotives Miscellany More W.D. 2-8-0's appear to be allocated to B.A.; many of these engines were lately standing about in the Dover areas. 'Schools' 907 'Dulwich,' 917 'Ardingly,' 934 'St. Lawrence' are light green. 'Demob.' specials are still running frequently from Folkestone, etc., to Guildford via Tonbridge and Redhill, worked to the latter by locos, carrying Dover spare duty Nos, 462-3, but actually the engines are often B.A. or AFD. 4-4-0's. They return light from Redhill it not otherwise required. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 W.D. Locomotives The following have been noted at Folkestone recently: 77070/81, 77122/9, 77222, 77402/11/26/84, 77508, 78588. As they carried allocations painted on the cab sides, they have presumably been in traffic on the continent. SLS/194605
31/01/1947 General Several 'Austerity' 2-8-0's are being repaired for service on the L.N.E.R. both at Eastleigh and Brighton, Nos. 77046/61, 77235, 77453/4, 77484 at the former and 77070, 77108, 77402/11/18, 79220, 78603, 77129, 77371/95, 77426 at the latter. 77411 has already left Brighton shops painted black, to he followed by 77070. Shed markings include La Delivrance, Le Mans, Desing Balls, Acheres, etc. Some of the tenders bear different numbers from the engines, but are renumbered to correspond with the engine number when painted. These engines are being classified '0.7' on the L.N.E.R. SLS/194702
28/02/1954 Darlington Works North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. SLS/195404
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7402
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25272
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77402    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90280    
26/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
05/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90280    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev