Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 803 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2484 Week
» 22777 Month
» 200681 Year
» 1866057 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7404 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77404 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90281 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25274
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
91M   To London Midland Region on 08/07/1950
56D   Mirfield w/e 20/06/1959
56E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 18/06/1960
56A   Wakefield w/e 11/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN THJ Thornton Junction on 10/03/1947
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region on 08/07/1950
LOAN 25C Goole w/e 08/07/1950
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 56E Sowerby Bridge 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. SLS/196701
08/01/1967 Crewe Works (Side of Works) Erecting shop-60007/10, 70013, 92220, D293, D388, D1505/7/23/92, D1622/30, D1728/56/74/81/91/7/8, D1805/37, D5711, D8005/43, E3001/2/14/6/22/3/6/9/45/6/68, E3100/99, E5023, E5015(E6101), E5016 (E6102), E5006(E6103). Old Paint shop-D249, D1102/9/10/1/5/94, D5709, D8061, E3064, E5019, 92009. Side of Works-D5710/3, 90243/81. Traverser area-D233, D1525, D1619, D1751, D1977, D5715, D8017, 60026, 71000. New shop-D251, D284, D332, D346, D364, D366, D1513/68/79, D1617, D1750, D1925/43. Electric shop-E3171, E26050. New Paint shop: D1621/9, D1758/77. No sign of E5024-the conversions appear to be having completely new bodies apart from cabs and are somewhat lengthened in appearance. SLS/196702
19/02/1967 Crewe Works (Old paint shop area) Erecting shop-D1506/9/17, D1605/26/33/98, D1744/54/65/70/94/9, D1802, E3002/13/26/45/6/68/70/1, E3131/52/63/99, D213/81/2, D382, D8054, E5003, E6101/2/3/4/5, E26018/25. Traverser Area-D1501/5/12/5/88, 60026, 71000, E3025/79, D385, D8003. New shop-D390, D1514/8/9/73/89, D1635/94, D1736/53/9, D1851, D1948, D8123/38 (damaged). New paint shop-60007/10, 92220. Old paint shop area-90243/81, E26033, D378, D1596, D1852, D8048, E3016/105. SLS/196704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7404
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25274
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77404    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90281    
08/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90281    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev