Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 796 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4309 Week
» 24602 Month
» 202506 Year
» 1867882 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7406 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77406 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90282 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25276
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 10/01/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
27B   Aintree w/e 01/09/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 08/09/1951
40E   Colwick w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 10/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN THJ Thornton Junction on 07/08/1947
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   w/e 10/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7406
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25276
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77406    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90282    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
10/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90282    
03/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev