Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 273 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1974 Week
» 10089 Month
» 137532 Year
» 1802908 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7408 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77408 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90284 m/e 01/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25279
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/03/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
81C   Southall 4w/e 11/08/1951
81C   Southall 4w/e 31/08/1951
85A   Worcester 4w/e 08/09/1951
85A   Worcester 4w/e 30/09/1951
84B   Oxley 4w/e 19/04/1952
84B   Oxley 3w/e 17/05/1952
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 03/10/1953
81C   Southall 4w/e 04/12/1954
82B   St Philips Marsh 8w/e 26/03/1955
81F   Oxford m/e 16/06/1956
18B   Westhouses w/e 18/07/1959
9G   Gorton w/e 30/06/1962
8L   Aintree w/e 12/12/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 06/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN OXY Oxley m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC BAN Banbury m/e 31/07/1947
LOAN WOS Worcester m/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 18B Westhouses on 12/07/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1959
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 09/01/1965
WDN   w/e 06/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7408
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25279
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77408    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
01/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90284    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
06/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90284    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev