Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 152 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3665 Week
» 23958 Month
» 201862 Year
» 1867238 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7410 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77410 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3034 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63034 w/e 08/05/1948
British Railways 90034 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25281
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal Wed 05/09/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1963 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
33B   Tilbury 4w/e 10/05/1958
     Withdrawn on 05/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   on 05/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7410
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25281
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77410    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3034    
08/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63034    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90034    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
05/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90034    
01/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford    

prev prev