Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 791 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2472 Week
» 22765 Month
» 200669 Year
» 1866045 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7411 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77411 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90285 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25282
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 13/06/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
40B   Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 28/09/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK NWE New England on 25/01/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 23/03/1947
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 W.D. Locomotives The following have been noted at Folkestone recently: 77070/81, 77122/9, 77222, 77402/11/26/84, 77508, 78588. As they carried allocations painted on the cab sides, they have presumably been in traffic on the continent. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 Locomotives Miscellany More W.D. 2-8-0's appear to be allocated to B.A.; many of these engines were lately standing about in the Dover areas. 'Schools' 907 'Dulwich,' 917 'Ardingly,' 934 'St. Lawrence' are light green. 'Demob.' specials are still running frequently from Folkestone, etc., to Guildford via Tonbridge and Redhill, worked to the latter by locos, carrying Dover spare duty Nos, 462-3, but actually the engines are often B.A. or AFD. 4-4-0's. They return light from Redhill it not otherwise required. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 W.D. Locomotives The following have been noted at Folkestone recently: 77070/81, 77122/9, 77222, 77402/11/26/84, 77508, 78588. As they carried allocations painted on the cab sides, they have presumably been in traffic on the continent. SLS/194605
31/01/1947 General Several 'Austerity' 2-8-0's are being repaired for service on the L.N.E.R. both at Eastleigh and Brighton, Nos. 77046/61, 77235, 77453/4, 77484 at the former and 77070, 77108, 77402/11/18, 79220, 78603, 77129, 77371/95, 77426 at the latter. 77411 has already left Brighton shops painted black, to he followed by 77070. Shed markings include La Delivrance, Le Mans, Desing Balls, Acheres, etc. Some of the tenders bear different numbers from the engines, but are renumbered to correspond with the engine number when painted. These engines are being classified '0.7' on the L.N.E.R. SLS/194702
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7411
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25282
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77411    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90285    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
13/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90285    
09/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev